CHESS VALLEY BARBERSHOP SINGERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Another successful year as we re-build our repertoire and bring new members up to speed. In September we joined another chorus and a quartet on stage to entertain a sell-out audience. Shortly afterwards we hosted a Time to Harmonise course introducing a number of people to the enjoyment and benefits of singing in four-part close harmony. Some have auditioned and joined the chorus.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
Total income includes £1,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Other Charitable Activities
- Buckinghamshire
- Central Bedfordshire
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 15 March 2010: Standard registration
- KNIGHTS OF HARMONY (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sam Winwood | Trustee | 05 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Freestone | Trustee | 05 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ian Jones | Trustee | 05 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter Hawes | Trustee | 05 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy Elphick | Trustee | 18 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Neil Kennedy | Trustee | 19 September 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.69k | £15.40k | £13.85k | £19.39k | £32.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.57k | £18.61k | £10.45k | £19.39k | £26.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.80k | £1.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 27 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 27 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 12 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 09 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 12 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 08 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 DECEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE SOCIETY SHALL BE: 1. TO ADVANCE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN, AND APPRECIATION OF, THE ART AND SCIENCE OF UNACCOMPANIED FOUR PART HARMONY SINGING IN THE BARBERSHOP STYLE IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY ANY MEANS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT, INCLUDING THROUGH THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND RECITALS; 2. TO FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SHALL THINK FIT BUT IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE MAKING OF GRANTS AND DONATIONS.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
71 Vicarage Road
Marsworth
TRING
Hertfordshire
HP23 4LU
- Phone:
- 07771376567
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window