STOCKTON HEATH METHODIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Holding acts of worship at both Stockton Heath and Antrobus open to all to enable ordinary people to come to know the Lord Jesus; Meeting together in fellowship; Providing space and facilitating communitty activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

19 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Warrington
Governance
- 05 February 2010: Previously excepted registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Trevor Rhodes | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|||||||||
Ann Bolshaw | Trustee | 01 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Kathleen Elizabeth Hankey | Trustee | 01 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr Stephen John Bentley FRCP | Trustee | 01 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Rev Mark Harwood | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|||||||||
Karen Margaret Dixon-Maki | Trustee | 14 February 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
David Henry Maki | Trustee | 12 October 2020 |
|
|||||||||
Fiona Christobel Morton | Trustee | 12 October 2020 |
|
|||||||||
Vivien Palmer | Trustee | 10 October 2016 |
|
|||||||||
Margot Elizabeth Fairley Strong | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||||||
Ellen Julia Whitfield | Trustee | 14 October 2014 |
|
|
||||||||
JOHN ALAN STOTT | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
|||||||||
ALAN JAMES ROGERS | Trustee | 13 March 2012 |
|
|||||||||
Richard Verrill | Trustee | 13 March 2012 |
|
|||||||||
CHRISTOPHER ARDERN | Trustee | 13 March 2012 |
|
|
||||||||
GEOFFREY SIMON CLARKE | Trustee | 13 March 2012 |
|
|
||||||||
MRS CHRIS PARK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
JOHN DAVID HUMBLES | Trustee |
|
||||||||||
HAZEL RUTH BRADLEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £82.17k | £65.65k | £65.60k | £62.50k | £142.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £94.36k | £57.25k | £65.68k | £107.72k | £82.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 21 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 21 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 04 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 04 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 18 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 18 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 11 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 11 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976)
Charitable objects
The purposes of the Methodist Church are and shall be deemed to have been since the date of union the advancement of - (a) the Christian faith in accordance with the doctrinal standards and the discipline of the Methodist Church; (b) any charitable purpose for the time being of any Connexional, district, circuit, local or other organisation of the Methodist Church; (c) any charitable purpose for the time being of any society or institution subsiduary or ancillary to the Methodist Church; (d) any purpose for the time being of any charity being a charity subsidiary or ancillary to the Methodist Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Stockton Heath Methodist Church
Heath Street
Stockton Heath
WARRINGTON
WA4 6LP
- Phone:
- 01925266701
- Email:
- enquiries@shmc.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window