Barry Ministry Area

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the Christian religion in the Benefice and more widely by regular worship, pastoral care and concern for the wider community
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

14 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Vale Of Glamorgan
Governance
- 18 February 2010: Standard registration
- Barry Ministry Area (Working name)
- PARISH OF BARRY PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL (Previous name)
- Rectorial Benefice of Barry (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Shirley Elizabeth Powell | Trustee | 07 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||
Jill Osborne | Trustee | 16 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
Catherine Pease | Trustee | 16 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
Kay Myfanwy Charles | Trustee | 05 April 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Wendy Patricia Cook | Trustee | 05 April 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Mary Elizabeth Morris | Trustee | 05 April 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Rev Daniel Simon Barnes-Davies | Trustee | 25 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||
Rev Zoe Elizabeth King | Trustee | 25 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||
Susan Muriel Borges | Trustee | 21 April 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||
Rowena Hughes | Trustee | 29 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||
Caroline Joan Dodd | Trustee | 24 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||
John Keith Williams | Trustee | 29 September 2016 |
|
|||||||||||
Rev ROBERT CAREY PARRISH | Trustee | 29 September 2016 |
|
|
||||||||||
MARTIN DAVID EVANS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £385.49k | £220.91k | £220.91k | £181.32k | £146.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £239.54k | £185.01k | £185.01k | £245.58k | £240.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 20 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 26 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 06 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 02 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 02 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 31 MARCH 1920 as amended on 06 Aug 2019 as amended on 16 Apr 2023
Charitable objects
The promotion of the whole mission of the Church, pastoral, evangelistic, social and ecumenical, in the parish.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
All Saints Church Hall
(Rear of All Saints Church)
Park Road
Barry
CF62 6NU
- Phone:
- 01446737771
- Email:
- beneficeofbarry@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window