WALSALL WOOD COMMUNITY FOOTBALL CLUB

Charity overview
Regulatory alerts
- The Charity Commission has opened an inquiry Open in new window into the charity
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Sport Club and Community Club
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
120 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Walsall
Governance
- 13 September 2010: Standard registration
- WALSALL WOOD FOOTBALL AND SOCIAL CLUB (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darren Cotton | Trustee | 15 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ian Sylvester | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £177.67k | £126.25k | £115.69k | £265.22k | £263.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £237.03k | £165.74k | £165.88k | £385.63k | £313.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £11.21k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 10 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 10 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 14 January 2025 | 259 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
30 June 2023
(These accounts |
14 January 2025 | 259 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 10 May 2023 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 10 May 2023 | 10 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 16 August 2022 | 108 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 16 August 2022 | 108 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 16 August 2022 | 473 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 16 August 2022 | 473 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 27 APRIL 2009. CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 19 AUGUST 2010
Charitable objects
3. THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE CHARITY IS ESTABLISHED ARE TO BE EFFECTED WITHIN THE AREA OF WALSALL WOOD AND ITS SURROUNDING DISTRICTS ("THE AREA OF BENEFIT") AND ARE AS FOLLOWS: 3.1 TO PROMOTE ALL OR ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT. 3.2 WITHOUT LIMITATATION TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING, TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE PLAYING OF FOOTBALL.
Area of benefit
WALSALL WOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Walsall Wood FC
Lichfield Road
Walsall Wood
WALSALL
WS9 9NP
- Phone:
- 07939075285
- Email:
- IAN.EXCEL@BTCONNECT.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window