Financial history THE OFFICERS' MESS, JOINT SERVICE COMMAND AND STAFF COLLEGE (JSCSC), SHRIVENHAM

Charity number: 1133522
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £86.92k £67.70k £52.49k £1.60m £70.22k
Total expenditure £125.19k £36.74k £41.59k £153.92k £61.99k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £28.00k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £122.54k N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £1.48m N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £87.85k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £60.49k N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £5.59k N/A