Financial history UKGBC

Charity Number: 1135153
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £2.29m £2.31m £3.09m £2.86m £3.53m
Total expenditure £2.40m £2.13m £2.98m £3.26m £3.74m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £53.04k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £54.18k £31.58k £58.80k £53.70k £68.12k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £2.19m £2.26m £3.03m £2.80m £3.43m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £7.51k £3.46k £4.97k £8.17k £24.69k
Income - Other £32.19k £8.56k £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.40m £2.13m £2.98m £3.26m £3.74m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £111.93k £252.48k £10.07k £299.11k £22.68k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0