BOSTON AND DISTRICT SICK POOR FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Donations to Sick & Poor who reside in Boston and District
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 26 March 1971: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SUSAN MARGARET GANLEY MBE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Elizabeth Marriott | Trustee | 23 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Veronica Robinson | Trustee | 17 September 2019 |
|
|||||
SALLY WILKINSON | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
ANN WOODS | Trustee | 11 May 2012 |
|
|||||
MR RAY SHARPE | Trustee | 04 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
MISS SUE KIRK | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.74k | £2.64k | £2.57k | £2.57k | £1.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.52k | £1.27k | £2.36k | £2.53k | £1.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 21 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 04 November 2021 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 25 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE 17TH FEBRUARY 1950
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF SICK POOR PERSONS OF BOSTON AND DISTRICT.
Area of benefit
BOSTON AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
65 MANOR GARDENS
BOSTON
PE21 6JJ
- Phone:
- 01205368977
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window