HEALTH PARTNERSHIP NEPAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We partner with hospitals in Nepal (including Nepal Medical College and Teaching Hospital and Charikot Hospital). UK and Nepalese clinicians have teamed up since 2009 to complete rural outreach health projects. We offer these communities health consultations, public health interventions and provide referral links. We provide training to healthcare providers according to their development needs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Wandsworth
- Nepal
Governance
- 08 February 2010: Standard registration
- HPN (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JUNE ASHFORTH | Trustee | 23 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
ZAHID MUKHTAR | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £70.84k | £13.42k | £14.95k | £37 | £3.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.58k | £4.65k | £12.10k | £10 | £3.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 15 August 2024 | 76 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 23 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 26 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 22 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 22 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 09 DECEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
1 THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AMONG PEOPLE RESIDING PERMANENTLY OR TEMPORARILY IN RURAL NEPAL 2 TO ADVANCE HEALTH EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN RURAL NEPAL 3 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF TRAINING OF NEPALESE MEDICAL STUDENTS AND HEALTH CARE PROFESSIONALS PARTICIPATING WITH HPN
Area of benefit
NEPAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Health Partnership Nepal
Department of Paediatric Surgery
5th Floor, Lanesborough Wing
St George's Hospital
London
SW17 0RE
- Phone:
- 07881502384
- Email:
- info@hpnepal.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window