STAFFORD METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity supports the 10 churches within the Stafford circuit by the provision of ministers and lay workers to undertake Christian leadership through church services, pastoral work within the communities, schools & youth work.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

37 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 06 May 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
37 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev David Jonathan Bintliff | Chair | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Paul Christopher Yates | Trustee | 04 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Ian James Bradburn | Trustee | 20 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Timothy BAHonsMLIB | Trustee | 26 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Ann Wall | Trustee | 26 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ian Allred | Trustee | 26 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Alison Jayne Horton FCCA | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jill O'Byrne RGN | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Day | Trustee | 05 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev David Middleton | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Beverley Godridge | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Bruce Barker | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jane Louise Barker RVN | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ian Mason | Trustee | 12 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Robert David Johnson | Trustee | 12 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kenneth Charles Davies | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Arthur Hemingway BSc AFIMA | Trustee | 25 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Susan Francis | Trustee | 30 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Dr Susan McCready-Shea | Trustee | 01 December 2019 |
|
|||||
Valerie Elizabeth Bates | Trustee | 28 November 2019 |
|
|||||
Maureen Embrey BEd,CertEd | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Terry Anson Steed Goodchild | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Peter Walton Hardy BSc Hons | Trustee | 12 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dorothy Helen Kirkham B Ed Hons | Trustee | 10 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Allan J Lowe | Trustee | 27 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Lynn Margaret Westoby | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
AMICIA HARDY | Trustee | 28 September 2017 |
|
|||||
Brenda Gillespie | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM DENYS BASFORD | Trustee | 01 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Alice Elizabeth Dair | Trustee | 27 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Ian Francis Baldwin | Trustee | 23 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
CLIVE GILLESPIE | Trustee | 08 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
KATHRYN ANNE FORD | Trustee | 21 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER MARY TIMMIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CAROLYN ANNE HAMER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LEIGH BARBARA READE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARGARET ELIZABETH HEMINGWAY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £237.21k | £615.87k | £221.71k | £230.36k | £260.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £252.85k | £309.31k | £268.80k | £284.42k | £273.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £372.59k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £6.94k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £235.64k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £698 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £309.31k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £2.40k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £44.35k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 02 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 02 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 26 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 26 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976)
Charitable objects
The purposes of the Methodist Church are and shall be deemed to have been since the date of union the advancement of - (a) the Christian faith in accordance with the doctrinal standards and the discipline of the Methodist Church; (b) any charitable purpose for the time being of any Connexional, district, circuit, local or other organisation of the Methodist Church; (c) any charitable purpose for the time being of any society or institution subsiduary or ancillary to the Methodist Church; (d) any purpose for the time being of any charity being a charity subsidiary or ancillary to the Methodist Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ASBURY HOUSE
MERREY ROAD
STAFFORD
ST17 9LX
- Phone:
- 01785229973
- Email:
- admin@staffmc.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window