HTA SHEBA FOUNDATION UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ÔÇó To relieve poverty, sickness and distress who are in need by reason of age, infirmity, disability or youth. ÔÇó To promote charitable purposes especially for such purposes for the protection and preservation of health; ÔÇó The Provision of facilities for recreation and leisure time occupation in the interests of social welfare with the object of improving the conditions of life.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 13 April 2010: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ashik AHMED | Chair | 01 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sadar Uddin Ahmed | Trustee | 20 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Masum Uddin Ahmed | Trustee | 20 February 2025 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.42k | £3.04k | £5.94k | £3.80k | £1.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.27k | £1.83k | £2.93k | £6.90k | £1.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 19 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 23 April 2024 | 23 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 22 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 18 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 18 February 2022 | 324 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 MARCH 2010
Charitable objects
HTA SHEBA FOUNDATION UK SHALL PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY, INCLUDING THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, TO MEET THE NEEDS OF DISABLED, CHILDREN, WIDOWS, ELDERLY, PEOPLE IN NEED, ORPHANS, HEALTH AND HOMELESSNESS, AS WELL AS THE RELIEF ON NATURAL DISASTERS.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
128 Drew ROAD
LONDON
E16 2DG
- Phone:
- 02086173248
- Email:
- pervezashraf@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window