Trustees UNITED CHURCH, WINCHESTER
Charity number: 1135083

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Timothy Andrew Searle | Chair | 01 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
Jane Elizabeth Lawson | Trustee | 17 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Janet Mariam Messer | Trustee | 18 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Adrian John Bulley | Trustee | 18 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr John Kenneth Lander | Trustee | 12 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Barber | Trustee | 24 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Martin John Ramsey | Trustee | 24 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Johanna Dorothy Pellatt | Trustee | 19 March 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.