AL KAWTHAR FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide relief of poverty, sickness and distress, advancement of the Islamic religion in accordance with the "Shia" school of thought and to advance education.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England
Governance
- 03 March 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SHABBIRALI MOHAMED HUSEIN WALJI | Chair |
|
|
|||||
RIZWAN SHAFIQ WALJI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NURJEHAN SHABBIRALI WALJI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
REZAHUSSEIN MAHMOOD HOODA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £49.30k | £93.00k | £74.00k | £139.47k | £45.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £53.30k | £44.20k | £203.59k | £195.20k | £77.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 05 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 05 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 08 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 08 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 20 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 21 February 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED 23 DECEMBER 2009 AS AMENDED BY DEED OF VARIATION 15 FEBRUARY 2010
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES HEREBY DECLARE THAT THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY THAT THE TRUSTEES WILL BE PURSUING WILL BE: A) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS BY PROVIDING SUCH SERVICES AND FACILITIES AS ARE NECESSARY INCLUDING FOOD, CLOTHING AND MEDICAL SUPPLIES; B) TO ADVANCE THE ISLAMIC RELIGION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE "SHIA" SCHOOL OF THOUGHT BY SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE; C) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION BY PROVIDING GRANTS AND SUCH ITEMS, SERVICES AND FACILITIES AS REQUIRED PARTICULARLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY FOR THE BENEFIT OF YOUNG PEOPLE.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
PROSPECT HOUSE
50 LEIGH ROAD
EASTLEIGH
HAMPSHIRE
SO50 9DT
- Phone:
- 02380610573
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window