PETER JOHN MURRAY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
(1) To make available such grants of funds or equipment or other property to registered charities and voluntary organisations for such charitable purposes according to the laws of England and Wales as the Trustees shall think fit and ; (2) In accordance with the laws of England and Wales to promote such other charitable objects as the Trustees shall from time to time determine.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout London
Governance
- 16 March 2010: Standard registration
- PJM TRUST (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PETER MURRAY | Chair |
|
|
|||||
RECILDA MURRAY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
EDITH MURRAY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.25k | £5.50k | £3.00k | £3.57k | £2.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.06k | £4.88k | £4.73k | £4.01k | £2.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 April 2024 | 161 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 November 2020 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 23 DECEMBER 2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 16 FEBRUARY 2010
Charitable objects
(1) TO MAKE AVAILABLE SUCH GRANTS OF FUNDS OR EQUIPMENT OR OTHER PROPERTY TO REGISTERED CHARITIES AND VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL THINK FIT AND; (2) IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES TO PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE OBJECTS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FORM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
PJM TRUST
78 YORK STREET
LONDON
W1H 1DP
- Phone:
- 02075041300
- Email:
- info@pjm-trust.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window