KARIS NEIGHBOUR SCHEME

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
KARIS NEIGHBOUR SCHEME SEEKS TO OFFER PRACTICAL SUPPORT, FRIENDSHIP AND ADVOCACY IN THE LOCAL COMMUNITY THROUGH VOLUNTEERS AND STAFF. WE AIM TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY LINKS AND ADDRESS NEEDS UNMET BY OTHER ORGANISATIONS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £22,140 from 3 government contract(s) and £72,233 from 6 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
70 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 12 January 2010: Standard registration
- 30 April 2021: Funds received from 1077200 KARIS NEIGHBOUR SCHEME
- WHOLECARE(KNS) (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andy Northcott | Trustee | 25 November 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Elizabeth Cudjoe | Trustee | 24 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Alexander Elphinston | Trustee | 22 April 2022 |
|
|||||||
Henry Aggrey | Trustee | 22 April 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Gillian Ruth Harley-Mason | Trustee | 19 September 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Kathryn Anne Miles | Trustee | 05 February 2016 |
|
|
||||||
REBECCA JOY CUTHBERT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
DR ROSS BRYSON | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £266.29k | £316.15k | £271.28k | £303.67k | £306.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £237.94k | £264.41k | £248.25k | £283.62k | £307.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £19.09k | £19.34k | £19.65k | £56.98k | £22.14k | |
|
Income from government grants | £36.14k | £98.64k | £81.57k | £67.31k | £72.23k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 16 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 01 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 01 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 08 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 08 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 16 MAY 2008
Charitable objects
TO ASSIST PEOPLE WHO ARE IN NEED OF PRACTICAL OR OTHER HELP BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE BIRMINGHAM CITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O CHURCH OF THE REDEEMER
MONUMENT ROAD
EDGBASTON
BIRMINGHAM
WEST MIDLANDS
B16 8UU
- Phone:
- 01214557524
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window