BERKSHIRE SURREY BORDERS METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of regular public acts of worship open to members of the church and non-members alike; Pastoral work including visiting the sick and bereaved; Promotion of Christian activities through the staging of events and services; Supporting other charities in the UK and overseas financially and with prayer.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

32 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bracknell Forest
- Hampshire
- Surrey
- Wokingham
Governance
- 24 February 2010: Previously excepted registration
- SOUTH EAST BERKSHIRE METHODIST CIRCUIT (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
32 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev CATHERINE BOWSTEAD | Chair | 01 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Geoff Peck | Trustee | 06 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Sobanathasar Sinnathamby BD | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ian Henry Hamilton ONC HNC | Trustee | 07 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lynne Paine BSc | Trustee | 16 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mike Bush BSc | Trustee | 10 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Christine Elizabeth Rooke-Matthews | Trustee | 18 June 2020 |
|
|||||
Robert John Godden M.A | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Pauline Matondo BA | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Donald Hewitt M Mariner | Trustee | 01 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jane Bonney BA Hons | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|||||
Wendy Hart | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rev Sharon Gardner | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
MALCOLM SOUTER | Trustee | 01 June 2017 |
|
|||||
Kim Patricia Tame BTh, ACIM | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Wright | Trustee | 01 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
MARJORIE MITCHELL | Trustee | 24 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW MOWER BSC | Trustee | 01 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Keg Glossop | Trustee | 27 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Spain BSc Hons | Trustee | 15 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
CLAIRE LOUISE KNIGHT | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|||||
SAMMY HANNA | Trustee | 17 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM FRADGLEY BSC, CENG | Trustee | 16 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
MARY GLAUERT | Trustee | 10 December 2012 |
|
|||||
ANDREW MITCHELL | Trustee | 14 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
Dr Brian A Gennery MBE, FRCP | Trustee | 01 July 2011 |
|
|||||
David Dickinson Vaughan Morgan | Trustee |
|
||||||
ROBERT CLARK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHRISTINE ELIZABETH MORGAN | Trustee |
|
||||||
LEE KIRK ELMS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HAZEL IRENE GENNERY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN HOSKINS BSC, FRICS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £193.36k | £201.93k | £143.54k | £215.44k | £253.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £249.20k | £240.97k | £272.40k | £259.54k | £271.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 12 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 12 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 14 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 14 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 23 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 23 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 29 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 29 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 31 October 2020 | 123 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 31 October 2020 | 123 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976) AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION OF 2012/03/20 TO AMEND NAME
Charitable objects
The purposes of the Methodist Church are and shall be deemed to have been since the date of union the advancement of - (a) the Christian faith in accordance with the doctrinal standards and the discipline of the Methodist Church; (b) any charitable purpose for the time being of any Connexional, district, circuit, local or other organisation of the Methodist Church; (c) any charitable purpose for the time being of any society or institution subsiduary or ancillary to the Methodist Church; (d) any purpose for the time being of any charity being a charity subsidiary or ancillary to the Methodist Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Circuit Office
Wokingham Methodist Church
Rose Street
Wokingham
Berkshire
RG40 1XS
- Phone:
- 01189776898
- Email:
- bsbcircuit@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window