THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETERS CHURCH, CROYDON

Charity number: 1136488
Charity reporting is up to date (78 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Part of the South Croydon Benefice of the Church of England, Southwark Diocese. We are a friendly and welcoming benefice. Our services have a traditional feel; we also enjoy the challenge of creating alternative worship. We believe in a church that cares for the community, its congregation, its parish and the wider world. We are a benefice where everyone belongs, is valued and can grow in faith.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £100,791
Total expenditure: £102,692

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Croydon

Governance

Registration history:
  • 21 June 2010: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • ST PETER'S CHURCH P.C.C, CROYDON (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Geoffrey James William Dumbreck Chair 22 July 2019
THE FRIENDS OF SAINT GILES' CHURCH CAMBRIDGE
Received: On time
SOUTH CROYDON CENTRE
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SAINT AUGUSTINE, SOUTH CROYDON
Recently registered
Steve Moores Trustee 12 May 2024
None on record
Bev Foulkes-Jones Trustee 12 May 2024
None on record
KAREN PERCIVAL Trustee 12 May 2024
None on record
JONATHAN ASHURST BARRETT WELLER Trustee 12 May 2024
None on record
Mikitha Sudarshan Trustee 23 April 2023
None on record
Lucy Dee Trustee 23 April 2023
None on record
Sudarshan Desikan Trustee 23 April 2023
None on record
Benjamin Wilson Trustee 15 May 2022
THE ASSOCIATION FOR PASTORAL CARE IN MENTAL HEALTH
Received: On time
Gareth Saunders Trustee 13 April 2014
None on record
ANDREW GRAHAM MONCRIEFF BSC Trustee
None on record
DAVID THOMAS PERCIVAL Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £135.54k £92.95k £140.07k £121.83k £100.79k
Total expenditure £123.82k £175.75k £263.17k £138.84k £102.69k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £4.90k £4.77k £20.09k £3.29k N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 17 January 2025 78 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 17 January 2025 78 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 13 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 30 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 18 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 18 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 21 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 21 May 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 19 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 19 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
123 Upper Selsdon Road
Sanderstead
South Croydon
Surrey
CR2 0DU
Phone:
02086681350