INSPIRE MALAWI

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Activities in Ntcheu & Dedza District focuses on school infrastructure development & permaculture and community development. For example providing new infrastructure, developing current facilities to improve teaching and learning environment, providing suitable sanitary and assisting in permaculture and tree planting.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Malawi
Governance
- 22 March 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MICHELLE ROWE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Gill Lynch | Trustee | 05 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
JESSICA HODGES | Trustee | 20 June 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.13k | £16.09k | £30.48k | £21.20k | £12.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £32.80k | £22.19k | £18.40k | £16.22k | £19.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 02 August 2024 | 63 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 30 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 14 June 2022 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 19 March 2023 | 292 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 18 March 2022 | 291 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 08 January 2021 | 222 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26 SEPTEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PEOPLE (AND PARTICULARLY AMONGST THOSE IN PRIMARY AND SECONDARY EDUCATION) IN MALAWI (AFRICA) IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
MALAWI
Contact information
- Address:
-
402 Libertine Works
5 Stanton Walk
LONDON
E2 9FR
- Phone:
- 00447919523049
- Email:
- LIZULU@HOTMAIL.CO.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window