Financial history TELUGU ASSOCIATION OF LONDON

Charity number: 1137074
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £61.85k £23.62k £50.66k £71.51k £85.58k
Total expenditure £60.02k £12.95k £48.69k £72.09k £98.63k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A