TELUGU ASSOCIATION OF LONDON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Preserve, maintain and carry forward the cultural heritage of Telugu Community in the UK. . Organise periodic Telugu literary, cultural and educational conferences, seminars, workshops to promote TAL objectives; and, to collaborate, cooperate, assist and encourage Telugu literary, cultural and educational conferences, seminars in the UK and other countries.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 26 July 2010: Standard registration
- TAL (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ravi Sabba | Chair | 09 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kiran Kappeta | Trustee | 09 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Venkatesham Neela | Trustee | 09 December 2023 |
|
|||||
SREEDEVI ALEDDULA | Trustee | 09 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ravi K R Mocherla | Trustee | 09 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ashok Madishetti | Trustee | 09 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anil Ananthula | Trustee | 07 November 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £61.85k | £23.62k | £50.66k | £71.51k | £85.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £60.02k | £12.95k | £48.69k | £72.09k | £98.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01/12/2008 AS AMENDED ON 01/07/2010 AS AMENDED ON 01/06/2014 AS AMENDED ON 20/12/2014
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC PARTICULARLY AND NOT EXCLUSIVELY THE TELUGU COMMUNITY IN THE UNITED KINGDOM, IN PARTICULAR 1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION INCLUDING EDUCATION IN TELUGU HISTORY, CULTURE AND CUSTOMS 2 THE RELIEF OF POVERTY 3 THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE 4 THE PROMOTION OF RACIAL HARMONY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY (FOR EXAMPLE) A PROMOTING KNOWLEDGE AND MUTUAL UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS B ADVANCING EDUCATION AND RAISING AWARENESS ABOUT DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS TO PROMOTE GOOD RELATIONS BETWEEN PERSONS OF DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS C WORKING TOWARDS THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF RACE 5 SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE
Area of benefit
THE TELUGU COMMUNITY IN THE UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
147 The Broadway
Ealing
LONDON
W13 9BE
- Phone:
- 07970977119
- Email:
- contact@taluk.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window