YORK AND DISTRICT CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We aim to provide the advice people need for the problems they face and improve the policies and practices that affect people's lives. We provide free, independent, confidential and impartial advice to everyone on their rights and responsibilities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £250,394 from 4 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- City Of York
Governance
- 13 January 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gill Bull | Trustee | 05 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Robson | Trustee | 11 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Philip Alan Zastawniak-Thomas | Trustee | 18 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael Galloway | Trustee | 24 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lauren Peel | Trustee | 24 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Janet Mary Looker | Trustee | 02 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Julia Atwater | Trustee | 28 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Joanna de Groot | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Maria Theresa Ling-Williams | Trustee | 24 January 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £433.33k | £449.35k | £444.59k | £460.37k | £438.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £427.69k | £406.95k | £422.24k | £486.02k | £471.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £257.87k | £237.02k | £232.97k | £249.16k | £250.39k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 03 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 03 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 05 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 05 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 29/08/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15/10/2013 as amended on 25 Oct 2023
Charitable objects
THE CHARITYÃS OBJECTS ARE TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS IN PARTICULAR, BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN YORK AND SURROUNDING AREAS.
Area of benefit
YORK AND SURROUNDING AREAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
West Offices
Station Rise
YORK
YO1 6GA
- Phone:
- 01904 623648
- Email:
- admin.team@cayork.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window