ASHANTI DEVELOPMENT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our mission is to relieve poverty and promote health and development in and around the Ashanti Region of Ghana by means including the provision of safe and accessible water.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Economic/community Development/employment
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Ghana
Governance
- 13 January 2010: Standard registration
- 29 September 2011: Funds received from 1112415 ASHANTI DEVELOPMENT
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jasmine Elizabeth Buckley | Trustee | 01 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Professor Richard Black | Trustee | 18 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Saulius Sliackus | Trustee | 04 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
William Oteng-Mensah | Trustee | 27 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Helen Louise Booth | Trustee | 09 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Christopher James Hartley-Sharpe | Trustee | 09 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Judith-Anne Esme Keep | Trustee | 09 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Helen Dawn Williamson | Trustee | 09 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr David Charles Rees PhD | Trustee | 09 May 2015 |
|
|||||
ALBERT KWAME ANTWI | Trustee | 10 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
MARTHA BOADU | Trustee |
|
||||||
PENNY DAVID | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £186.14k | £127.42k | £240.35k | £159.25k | £164.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £225.36k | £130.50k | £169.08k | £165.21k | £152.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 10 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 17 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 03 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 03 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 03 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 29 DECEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO RELIEVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND TO PROMOTE GOOD HEALTH AND EDUCATION IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF SAFE AND ACCESSIBLE WATER SUPPLIES. THE AREA OF BENEFIT MEANS THE ASHANTI REGION OF GHANA AND ITS ENVIRONS.
Area of benefit
THE ASHANTI REGION OF GHANA AND ITS ENVIRONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 21
Downing Court
Grenville Street
London
WC1N 1LX
- Phone:
- 07713743398
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window