THE MERIONETH AGRICULTURAL SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Organise an annual county agricultural show.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
200 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Gwynedd
Governance
- 09 March 1972: Standard registration
- MERIONETH COUNTY SHOW (Working name)
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HEDD PUGH | Chair |
|
||||||
Arwel Roberts | Trustee | 28 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robert Dewi Owen | Trustee | 04 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Trefor Francis Hughes | Trustee | 28 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
HUW LLOYD | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £66.48k | £14.92k | £104 | £69.57k | £91.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £82.53k | £19.96k | £16.51k | £88.88k | £92.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 08 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 29 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 02 November 2022 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 March 2022 | 133 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 November 2020 | 23 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 23 November 2020 | 23 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 1868 AS AMENDED 12 FEBRUARY 1972
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AGRICULTURE BY HOLDING AN ANNUAL AGRICULTURAL SHOW IN THE COUNTY OF MERIONETH FOR THE EXHIBITION OF FARMING STOCK, IMPLEMENTS AND PRODUCE, WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THE BREEDING OF LIVESTOCK AND PROMOTING THE ADOPTION OF IMPROVED METHODS OF FARMING.
Area of benefit
MERIONETHSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Nant y Glyn
Lon Ednyfed
CRICCIETH
LL52 0LD
- Phone:
- 07886 081392
- Email:
- sioesir@aol.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window