THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHRIST CHURCH, CAMBERWELL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Pentecostal Anglican Church in Peckham, London. Activities include Sunday services, healing ministries, conferences and community events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Southwark
Governance
- 14 September 2010: Standard registration
- CHRIST CHURCH OLD KENT ROAD (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Obiora Ozonzeadi | Chair | 14 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev Fernando Carrillo | Trustee | 23 June 2024 |
|
|||||
CHRISTOPHER MARK DEACON | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christine Browne | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Samuel Olatunji | Trustee | 10 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Babajide Akinjuku | Trustee | 14 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lorna Shaw | Trustee | 07 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Aleksandra Forsythe | Trustee | 26 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
LENA NORMAN | Trustee | 06 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
FIONA ALMA FOREMAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £106.24k | £105.17k | £103.23k | £94.30k | £88.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £112.98k | £103.60k | £103.95k | £79.50k | £94.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 12 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 12 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 May 2024 | 213 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 May 2024 | 213 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 24 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 15 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 07 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 05 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
676-680 OLD KENT ROAD
LONDON
SE15 1JF
- Phone:
- 02077325935
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window