THE GUJARAT MUSLIM ASSOCIATION UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To support educational excellence by providing grants and funding to students in India.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
29 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
- India
Governance
- 03 May 2011: Standard registration
- GMA (Working name)
- THE GUJARAT MUSLIM ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JAMEEL AHMED MALIK Treasurer | Trustee | 07 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr TANVEERKHAN PATHAN Secretary | Trustee | 29 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
MARGHUB SHAIKH Vice.Pres | Trustee | 29 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Shoayb Pathan President | Trustee | 21 May 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 10/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £83.24k | £69.02k | £99.66k | £91.78k | £97.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £60.28k | £156.92k | £7.30k | £85.61k | £77.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 05 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 05 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 10 March 2023 | 11 January 2024 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 10 March 2023 | 11 January 2024 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 24 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28/11/2010 as amended on 12 Mar 2022 as amended on 12 Mar 2022 as amended on 07 Jul 2024
Charitable objects
A. The purpose of The Association shall be to centralise, co-ordinate and encourage the members to meet the religious, cultural, educational, social and economic needs of Urdu speaking Muslims of Gujarat State, India, presently settled in the United Kingdom and elsewhere. B. In particular, The Association is established: 1) To advance the educational, social, economic and religious needs, in particular of Urdu speaking Muslims of Gujarat State, India, presently settled in the United Kingdom and elsewhere. 2) To advance Sunni Islamic Education. 3) To relieve poverty, sickness and distress.
Area of benefit
GUJARAT STATE, INDIA
Contact information
- Address:
-
47 Marlborough Road
NUNEATON
Warwickshire
CV11 5PG
- Phone:
- 07464597722
- Email:
- secretary.thegma@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window