Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETER'S, STAPENHILL
Charity number: 1134143

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev MICHAEL ANDREYEV | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Steven Salmon | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gary Wright | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joshua Hawthorn | Trustee | 23 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew James Warton | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Attwood | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lynn Chapman | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Corinne Marsh | Trustee | 25 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
DAVID CUDWORTH ACMA CGMA | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.