UNITED METHODIST CHURCH CLIFTON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of regular public acts of worship open tho members of the church and non members alike. The teaching of Christianity through sermons, courses, bible study. Pastoral work including visiting the sick and bereaved. Promoting the whole mission of the church through Playgroup, Community cafe, Youth club, Holiday Club, Messy church. Supporting other charities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

27 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Rotherham
Governance
- 16 March 2010: Previously excepted registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
27 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Louise Makin | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Colin Colclough | Trustee | 17 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ivor Anthony Jordan | Trustee | 17 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kathleen Kendrick | Trustee | 17 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sylvia Mary Jordan | Trustee | 17 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Francis Lovell | Trustee | 17 May 2021 |
|
|||||
Roy Bott | Trustee | 17 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Williams | Trustee | 17 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anne Bagnall | Trustee | 17 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Bott | Trustee | 17 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peter Safhill | Trustee | 17 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mary Timmiss | Trustee | 21 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Karen Dunn | Trustee | 24 April 2016 |
|
|||||
Margaret Moran | Trustee | 24 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Brenda Cheetham | Trustee | 24 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Michael Bagnall | Trustee | 24 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
LUCY OLIVIA ARNO | Trustee | 27 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN LAURA JORDAN | Trustee | 27 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
JORDAN ALEXANDER ARNO | Trustee | 27 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
MRS PAT RAISON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JANET GRIFFITHS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS JENIFER LOVELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN RAISON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JUDITH ANN OLLIVANT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
STEPHEN KEITH HANNAM CQSW | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR JIM STEEL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARGARET MORAN | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £168.53k | £117.71k | £116.06k | £134.26k | £169.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £147.88k | £152.48k | £110.04k | £127.12k | £140.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £62.22k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 14 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 14 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 12 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 12 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 27 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 27 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976)
Charitable objects
The purposes of the Methodist Church are and shall be deemed to have been since the date of union the advancement of - (a) the Christian faith in accordance with the doctrinal standards and the discipline of the Methodist Church; (b) any charitable purpose for the time being of any Connexional, district, circuit, local or other organisation of the Methodist Church; (c) any charitable purpose for the time being of any society or institution subsiduary or ancillary to the Methodist Church; (d) any purpose for the time being of any charity being a charity subsidiary or ancillary to the Methodist Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Clifton Methodist Church
Lister Street
ROTHERHAM
S65 2AX
- Phone:
- 01709373449
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window