NOAHS ARK PRESCHOOL CULLOMPTON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide high quality early education and care to children aged 2 - 5 years during term time.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Devon
Governance
- 15 February 2010: Standard registration
- NOAH'S ARK PLAYGROUP CULLOMPTON (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Carla Wetherell | Trustee | 11 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
WENDY LAND | Trustee | 23 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Helen Webb | Trustee | 14 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alexandra Partridge | Trustee | 29 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Marilyn Bidmead | Trustee | 10 February 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £153.98k | £142.38k | £130.60k | £171.40k | £188.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £136.81k | £140.45k | £143.26k | £164.49k | £177.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £9.30k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 17 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 17 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 09 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 09 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 06 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 06 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 08 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 08 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 02/12/2009 AS AMENDED ON 09/10/2012
Charitable objects
THE AIMS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL ARE TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS AND BY: (A) OFFERING APPROPRIATE PLAY, EDUCATION AND CARE FACILITIES, FAMILY LEARNING AND EXTENDED HOURS GROUPS, TOGETHER WITH THE RIGHT OF PARENTS TO TAKE RESPONSIBILITY FOR AND TO BECOME INVOLVED IN THE ACTIVITIES OF SUCH GROUPS, ENSURING THAT SUCH GROUPS OFFER OPPORTUNITIES FOR ALL CHILDREN WHATEVER THEIR RACE, CULTURE, RELIGION, MEANS OR ABILITY (B) ENCOURAGING THE STUDY OF THE NEEDS OF SUCH CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES AND PROMOTING PUBLIC INTEREST IN AND RECOGNITION OF SUCH NEEDS IN THE LOCAL AREAS (C) INSTIGATING AND ADHERING TO AND FURTHERING THE AIMS AND OBJECTS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL LEARNING ALLIANCE.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Baptist Church
High Street
CULLOMPTON
EX15 1AB
- Phone:
- 01884839965
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window