Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HOLY TRINITY, RIPON, DIOCESE OF LEEDS
Charity number: 1135108

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nancy Benham MBE | Trustee | 13 January 2025 |
|
|||||
Jed Bates | Trustee | 25 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Helen Louise Wilks | Trustee | 25 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elliot Bennington | Trustee | 25 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tom Cavell-Taylor | Trustee | 17 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Allison Ruth Clark | Trustee | 17 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Donald Hanson | Trustee | 19 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Barry Crompton | Trustee | 15 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Metcalfe | Trustee | 15 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Phil Thomas | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.