THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARK'S, LITTLE COMMON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The regular public worship open to all. Pastoral work, including visiting the sick and the bereaved. Teaching of Christianity through sermons, courses and small groups. Taking of religious assemblies in schools. The provision of youth clubs with a Christian ethos. Promotion of Christianity through meetings and the distribution of literature. Supporting other charities in the UK and overseas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- East Sussex
Governance
- 18 March 2010: Previously excepted registration
- ST. MARK'S P.C.C.,LITTLE COMMON (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev JONATHAN JEREMY FRAIS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Sandra Frohnsdorff | Trustee | 18 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Steve Whiting | Trustee | 23 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Mack | Trustee | 17 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Livings | Trustee | 18 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Doone Ellerton | Trustee | 18 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Johnson | Trustee | 18 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Arthur Gillman | Trustee | 18 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
ANNE ELIZABETH ANDERSEN | Trustee | 01 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
John Philpot | Trustee | 01 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
TONY JAMES GENT ACIB | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS SUE ROCHEFORT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CAROL LYNNE GENT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £104.14k | £88.34k | £105.52k | £137.23k | £129.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £119.59k | £105.95k | £105.12k | £117.22k | £111.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2024 | 366 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 04 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 04 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
197 Cooden Sea Road
Cooden
Bexhill-on-Sea
TN39 4TR
- Phone:
- 01424844210
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window