Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ALL SAINTS STREETLY.
Charity number: 1134127

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REV MANDY WALKER | Chair | 29 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
JULIE SMITH | Trustee | 29 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
CLARE EMMA JONES | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
NEIL CRABB | Trustee | 24 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER MAY HANDY | Trustee | 24 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
SONIA ANGELA ROBINSON | Trustee | 24 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN VINCENT WALLACE | Trustee | 22 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
JEREMY ANDREW SMITH | Trustee | 22 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
KATHERINE MARIA HUGHES | Trustee | 09 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
PAMELA SIMMS | Trustee | 09 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
YVONNE PAGE CALOGIROU | Trustee | 09 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL BOWEN PAYNE | Trustee | 09 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
CATHERINE ANNE PAYNE | Trustee | 09 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christopher William Payne | Trustee | 14 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Ann Lawrence | Trustee | 14 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Roy Lawrence | Trustee | 14 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
ALAN MYATT | Trustee | 17 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
ALAN FINCH | Trustee | 06 April 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.