YATTON METHODIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The proclamation of the Christian faith in word and deed.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

23 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- North Somerset
Governance
- 07 June 2010: Previously excepted registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
23 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Jill Alison Flowers | Chair | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Bethan Grace MARSHALL | Trustee | 11 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev CAROLE CHALLIS | Trustee | 06 June 2022 |
|
|||||
Rev Phillip Andrew Edward Challis | Trustee | 06 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emilia Joy Osborne | Trustee | 12 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Cynthia Hadfield | Trustee | 12 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Osborne | Trustee | 12 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm John Fisher | Trustee | 28 February 2022 |
|
|||||
Yvonne Marie Nelson | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Keith Mitchell | Trustee | 30 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Mitchell | Trustee | 30 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Keith Woodham | Trustee | 23 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
John Flowers | Trustee | 23 March 2018 |
|
|||||
Amanda Bangham | Trustee | 23 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
REV Ian Bowley | Trustee | 13 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN JAYNE TURNER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
VIRGINIA HELEN BUCKLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Andrew Philip Osborne | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Martin Stewart Buckley | Trustee |
|
||||||
Thomas Roger Calderbank | Trustee |
|
||||||
Barbara Hook | Trustee |
|
||||||
ANNE ELIZABETH BRITTEN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JANET BARBARA CALDERBANK | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £86.18k | £93.06k | £90.46k | £94.09k | £79.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £98.48k | £92.99k | £87.49k | £102.28k | £82.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 27 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 27 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 21 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 21 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 02 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 02 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 17 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 17 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 06 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 06 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976)
Charitable objects
The purposes of the Methodist Church are and shall be deemed to have been since the date of union the advancement of - (a) the Christian faith in accordance with the doctrinal standards and the discipline of the Methodist Church; (b) any charitable purpose for the time being of any Connexional, district, circuit, local or other organisation of the Methodist Church; (c) any charitable purpose for the time being of any society or institution subsiduary or ancillary to the Methodist Church; (d) any purpose for the time being of any charity being a charity subsidiary or ancillary to the Methodist Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 ASHLEIGH CRESCENT
YATTON
BRISTOL
BS49 4DF
- Phone:
- 01934835934
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window