EARLHAM INSTITUTE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of biological & biotechnological science by undertaking & promoting research in biology at the molecular level & the genomic functions of organisms by: generating, analysing & sharing genome sequences; facilitating other researchers by providing access to our data analysis resources & tools; & educating others through comprehensive training programmes, publications & outreach work.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£14,012,000
Donations and legacies | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £13.30m | |
Other trading activities | £135.00k | |
Investments | £579.00k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£13,467,000
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £13.43m | |
Other | £34.00k |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £11,271,000 from 61 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £34.00k | |
Charitable expenditure | £13.43m | |
Retained for future use | £545.00k |
People

107 Employee(s)
8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 8 |
£70k to £80k | 6 |
£80k to £90k | 2 |
£110k to £120k | 1 |
£120k to £130k | 1 |
£150k to £200k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Colombia
Governance
- 07 June 2010: Standard registration
- THE GENOME ANALYSIS CENTRE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gillian Amanda Fairfield | Trustee | 03 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Laura Mary Claire Barter | Trustee | 21 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Michael Csukai | Trustee | 19 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Kamombo | Trustee | 19 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Lars Magnus Rattray | Trustee | 21 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Stephanie Joan Pilkington | Trustee | 21 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Deborah Frances Smith | Trustee | 07 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Philip Gilmartin | Trustee | 03 December 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.61m | £11.14m | £14.26m | £15.84m | £14.01m | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.10m | £12.51m | £13.41m | £13.79m | £13.47m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.70m | £9.66m | £11.33m | £12.85m | £11.27m | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £438.00k | £435.00k | £319.00k | £151.00k | £135.00k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £12.04m | £10.65m | £13.90m | £15.46m | £13.30m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £127.00k | £56.00k | £47.00k | £236.00k | £579.00k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £13.88m | £12.43m | £13.30m | £13.74m | £13.43m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £111.00k | £95.00k | £104.00k | £95.00k | £133.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £222.00k | £83.00k | £103.00k | £50.00k | £34.00k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £10.86m | £9.35m | £9.21m | £12.72m | £13.52m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £17.10m | £18.79m | £19.61m | £23.11m | £18.10m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £4.97m | £6.52m | £6.35m | £11.30m | £6.55m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 12 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 23 MAR 2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21 MAY 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01 JUN 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09 JUN 2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13 JAN 2014 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 13 JUN 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20 DEC 2016
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE BIOLOGICAL AND BIOTECHNOLOGICAL SCIENCE BY UNDERTAKING AND PROMOTING RESEARCH RELATING TO GENOMES AND THE GENOME FUNCTIONS OF ORGANISMS, IN PARTICULAR BY CARRYING OUT THE FOLLOWING ACTIVITIES: 1. TO GENERATE AND ANALYSE GENOME SEQUENCES FOR THE FULL RANGE OF LIVING ORGANISMS; 2. TO GENERATE, RECORD AND STORE REFERENCE GENOME SEQUENCES; 3. TO RESEARCH THE WAYS IN WHICH GENOME FUNCTION AND VARIATION MAY BE EXPLOITED FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT; 4. TO DEVELOP AND EXPLOIT GENOMIC TECHNOLOGIES, SO AS TO IDENTIFY AND MEASURE GENOMES AND GENOME PRODUCTS; 5. TO DEVELOP BIOINFORMATICS IN RELATION TO GENOME RESEARCH, AND TO ANALYSE, INTERPRET AND EXPLOIT BIOINFORMATIC DATA IN RELATION TO GENOMES; AND 6. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION BY TRAINING PERSONS ENGAGED IN OR ASSOCIATED WITH GENOMICS, GENOME BIOLOGY, BIO-INFORMATICS AND RELATED SUBJECTS.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
NORWICH RESEARCH PARK
NORWICH
UK
NR4 7UZ
- Phone:
- 01603450861
- Email:
- enquiries@earlham.ac.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window