THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF LUTON ST ANNE WITH ST CHRISTOPHER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regular public worship open to all, pastoral work including visiting the sick and bereaved and promoting the whole mission of the Church through provision of activities for senior citizens, parents and toddlers groups and other groups within the community. In addition supporting other charities both in the UK and overseas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Luton
Governance
- 10 March 2010: Previously excepted registration
- ST ANNE'S WITH ST CHRISTOPHER'S PCC (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REV Anne Denise Crosby | Chair | 04 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Michael Whelan | Trustee | 18 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Susan Ann Whelan | Trustee | 18 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Olubukola Olowoye | Trustee | 18 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Verma Ionie Grey Denny | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Tuffnell | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Tracy Reeves | Trustee | 25 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dianne Scott | Trustee | 30 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Emma Reid | Trustee | 23 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
ANN JEANETTE MOORE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £105.15k | £70.90k | £44.91k | £51.76k | £76.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £111.53k | £77.15k | £65.03k | £48.98k | £73.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £500 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 03 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 03 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 09 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 09 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 17 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 17 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 01 November 2020 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 01 November 2020 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
33 Felix Avenue
Luton
LU2 7LE
- Phone:
- 01582850125
- Email:
- officestannechris@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window