Financial history BME UNITED LIMITED

Charity number: 1136857
Charity reporting is up to date (14 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £132.95k £210.50k £210.50k £31.91k £131.28k
Total expenditure £102.88k £221.86k £221.86k £42.38k £116.09k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A