GILLY'S GIFT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity is working to widen access for the whole community to Integrated Medicine by supporting the education of medical professionals and students and by providing funding for cancer patients with limited financial means to undertake doctor led Integrated Medicine programs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 16 March 2010: Standard registration
- GILLY'S GIFT TO INTEGRATED MEDICINE (Working name)
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANNE WOOD | Chair | 31 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Clare Erica Boyd | Trustee | 15 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
SIMON GUY GILL FCA | Trustee | 10 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
GILLIAN DOROTHY GILL | Trustee | 14 February 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.63k | £2.19k | £1.13k | £6.02k | £949 | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.94k | £2.87k | £7.18k | £13.82k | £8.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 13 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 03 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 FEBRUARY 2010
Charitable objects
(I) THE RELIEF AND SUPPORT, INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM CANCER AND THEIR CARERS. (II) THE ADVANCEMENT OF INTEGRATED MEDICINE AND INCREASING THE ACCESS FOR THE WHOLE COMMUNITY TO IT, BOTH IN THE TREATMENT AND PREVENTION OF ILLNESS,, BY: (A) THE EDUCATION OF THE MEDICAL PROFESSION AND THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN INTEGRATED MEDICINE AND PROACTIVE HEALTHCARE, (B) RESEARCHING AND SUPPORTING THE RESEARCH OF INTEGRATED MEDICINE AND PUBLISHING OR ASSISTING IN THE PUBLICATION OF THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH. (C) CARRYING OUT OF ANY OTHER LEGALLY CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN RELATION TO THE SUPPORT AND ADVANCEMENT OF INTEGRATED MEDICINE AND HEALTHCARE PROVIDED THAT IN EVERY CASE THE PURPOSE IS WHOLLY CHARITABLE AND FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THIS CLAUSE THE EXPRESSION "INTEGRATED MEDICINE" IS DEFINED AS A HOLISTIC APPROACH TO HEALTHCARE BOTH ON THE TREATMENT AND PREVENTION OF ILLNESS THAT UTILISES CONVENTIONAL MEDICINE, COMPLEMENTARY MEDICINE, ALTERNATIVE MEDICINE, NUTRITION AND SELF HELP TECHNIQUES
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
152 DOVERS GREEN ROAD
REIGATE
RH2 8BZ
- Phone:
- 01737245028
- Email:
- MAIL@GILLYSGIFT.ORG
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window