HARLESDEN METHODIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The church maintains regular Sunday worship and a programme of fellowships to help develop faith and nurture discipleship. There is a Youth ministry, including participation at an annual Conference 3Gen. The Church runs a Fresh Food Bank weekly operating with an open door policy, no referrals requested. It supports the Neighbourhood Forum, the Brent Multi Faith Forum and Churches Together.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Brent
Governance
- 25 February 2010: Previously excepted registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev SangWoo Seo | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Kofi Baah | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Sethlena Asomaniwaa Asante | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Bevan Powell | Trustee | 19 April 2015 |
|
|||||
Eric Dresden Oduro | Trustee |
|
||||||
Valerie Roslyn McCallum | Trustee |
|
||||||
EASMON LAVALY BSC | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RUPERT MIKELY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Ellen Boakye | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £164.98k | £135.32k | £134.37k | £132.18k | £144.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £252.95k | £141.44k | £185.77k | £127.97k | £151.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 17 July 2024 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 17 July 2024 | 17 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 23 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 23 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 11 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 11 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976)
Charitable objects
The purposes of the Methodist Church are and shall be deemed to have been since the date of union the advancement of - (a) the Christian faith in accordance with the doctrinal standards and the discipline of the Methodist Church; (b) any charitable purpose for the time being of any Connexional, district, circuit, local or other organisation of the Methodist Church; (c) any charitable purpose for the time being of any society or institution subsiduary or ancillary to the Methodist Church; (d) any purpose for the time being of any charity being a charity subsidiary or ancillary to the Methodist Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Harlesden Methodist Church
25 High Street
London
NW10 4NE
- Phone:
- 02031882032
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window