MERCHANTS AGAINST POVERTY & SICKNESS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trustees have commissioned the development of a new e-commerce website to assist with fundraising. The charity also sponsored an eye clinic in Karachi, Pakistan where 500 patients were treated for an array of conditions such as cataracts, infections, eye correction prescriptions, free reading glasses etc. The eye clinic was organised with a local charity called Maximizers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 20 December 2011
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 22 February 2010: Standard registration
- 25 April 2014: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 20/12/2010 | 20/12/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.00k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 20 December 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 20 December 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 20 December 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 20 December 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 20 December 2011 | 18 December 2012 | 59 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 20 December 2011 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 20 December 2010 | 10 October 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 20 December 2010 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 21 DECEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY AND/OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD BY PROVIDING: GRANTS, ITEMS, SERVICES AND PROVISIONS FOR HEALTHCARE PROJECTS TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY AND/OR SICKNESS
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window