THE WILLOWS DAYCARE LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of daycare and childcare, the latter including; before school, after school and out of school activities and care.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Suffolk
Governance
- 12 May 2010: Standard registration
- THE WILLOWS DAYCARE (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elizabeth Carol Ware | Trustee | 01 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
DENISE ANNE CAUSIER | Trustee | 31 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
Mark William Fotheringham | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £454.51k | £365.80k | £455.48k | £452.59k | £496.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £408.14k | £406.50k | £425.60k | £498.50k | £537.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £23.59k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 28 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 24 OCTOBER 2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE 26 APRIL 2010
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER THE AGE OF 11 BY: 1 THE PROVISION OF HIGH QUALITY DAYCARE AND CHILDCARE 2 TO WORK TO ENSURE THAT HIGH QUALITY DAYCARE AND CHILDCARE IS AVAILABLE TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES REGARDLESS OF MEANS, RACE, DISABILITY, GENDER, RELIGION, BELIEF OR ANY OTHER FACTOR 3 TO IDENTIFY THE WIDER SUPPORT NEEDS OF CHILDREN AND FAMILIES AND TO SEEK TO ENSURE THAT SUCH NEEDS ARE MET 4 TO ENCOURAGE, ENABLE AND SUPPORT THE INVOLVEMENT OF PARENTS AND CARERS IN THEIR CHILDREN'S LEARNING AND DEVELOPMENT 5 TO CONTRIBUTE TO THE PROFESSIONAL DEVELOPMENT OF THOSE WORKING IN DAYCARE AND CHILDCARE 6 TO ENCOURAGE AND ENABLE THE INVOLVEMENT OF PARENTS, CARERS AND THE WIDER COMMUNITY IN THE AFFAIRS OF THE CHARITY
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Willows Daycare Limited
c/o The Willows Family Hub
Magdalene Close
Ipswich
IP2 9UX
- Phone:
- 01473 601327
- Email:
- willowsipswich@hotmail.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window