THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF GREAT CROSBY ST FAITH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
* Regular public worship open to all * The provision of sacred space for personal prayer and contemplation * Pastoral work, including visiting the sick and bereaved * Teaching of Christianity through sermons, courses and small groups * Taking of religious assemblies in schools * Promotion of Christianity * Supporting other charities in the UK and overseas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

16 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Sefton
Governance
- 25 February 2010: Previously excepted registration
- ST FAITH'S PCC, GREAT CROSBY (Working name)
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Louis James Johnson PhD | Chair | 13 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Maureen Madden | Trustee | 04 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
NORMA IRENE LESLEY TAYLOR | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Mulholland | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev DENNIS AUSTIN SMITH | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Marguerita Derringer | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Norman Jeffrey Edwards | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mari Anne Griffiths | Trustee | 12 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Vivienne Shillitoe | Trustee | 12 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
HARRY RICHARD HUYTON | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|||||
Richard Harold Woodley | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rita Corinne Hedgecock | Trustee | 24 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Paula Lampard | Trustee | 19 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
RICK WALKER | Trustee | 27 August 2013 |
|
|||||
DAVID JOHN JONES MBE | Trustee | 21 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE SPENCE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £101.33k | £97.83k | £254.53k | £112.11k | £67.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £72.61k | £95.86k | £131.73k | £130.82k | £176.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £450 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 05 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 05 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 23 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 13 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 13 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 21 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 24 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
65 DUNBAR ROAD
SOUTHPORT
PR8 4RJ
- Phone:
- 01704567782
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window