ROOTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
a) The relief of poverty, sickness and the preservation and protection of health of orphans, in particular but not limited to orphans in Sri Lanka. b) The advancement of education of orphans in particular but not limited to orphans in Sri Lanka.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sri Lanka
Governance
- 15 June 2010: Standard registration
- ROOTS (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ARANI SOOSAIPILLAI | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.64k | £59.18k | £32.24k | £7.50k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.96k | £27.73k | £39.58k | £145.94k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 24 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 13 May 2024 | 137 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | Download Open in new window | |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 19 January 2023 | 22 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 09 May 2023 | 132 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 1 JANUARY 2010
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FORM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: A) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF HEALTH OF ORPHANS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO ORPHANS IN SRI- LANKA. B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF ORPHANS IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO ORPHANS IN SRI LANKA.
Area of benefit
SRI LANKA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
HARVEST HOUSE
HORIZON BUSINESS VILLAGE
1 BROOKLANDS ROAD
WEYBRIDGE
SURREY
KT13 0TJ
- Phone:
- 01932843354
- Email:
- INFO@ROOTS.UK.NET
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window