Accounts and annual returns ALLERGAN INTERNATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1135410
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2019 24 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 24 July 2020 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2018 20 September 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 20 September 2019 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2017 08 November 2018 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 08 November 2018 8 days late