YOUNG & SAFE IN GAINSBOROUGH
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the benefit of young people resident in or around Gainsborough, Lincolnshire without discrimination by: - advancing their education by the provision of advice & training related to health & social issues; - providing a cafe in the interests of social welfare for recreation & other leisure time occupations to maximise individual potential & improve life-chances.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Lincolnshire
- North Lincolnshire
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 30 March 2010: Standard registration
- 30 September 2015: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- YASIG (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £181.25k | £162.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £219.52k | £211.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 02 January 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | 02 January 2013 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 04 OCTOBER 2007
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF YOUNG PEOPLE RESIDENT WITHIN THE TOWN OF GAINSBOROUGH, LINCOLNSHIRE AND SURROUNDING DISTRICTS ('THE AREA OF BENEFIT') WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINION BY THE FOLLOWING MEANS: 3.1 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE SAID INHABITANTS IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE AND TRAINING RELATED TO HEALTH AND SOCIAL ISSUES, AND INTERNET AND COMPUTER ACCESS; 3.2 TO PROVIDE A CAFE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE AGED 14 TO 19 YEARS OLD IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND FOR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THOSE PERSONS.
Area of benefit
GAINSBOROUGH, LINCOLNSHIRE AND SURROUNDING DISTRICTS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window