THE METHODIST CHURCH - MANCHESTER CIRCUIT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support Churches in providing acts of worship open to members/non-members; sacred space for prayer/contemplation; teaching Christianity; pastoral work; promoting Christianity via events/services; youth/senior citizens'/men's/women's clubs with Christian ethos; promoting mission of Church (& aiding social cohesion) via activities for specific needs groups; support Charities financially & by prayer
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2022
People

49 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Manchester City
- Oldham
- Rochdale
- Tameside
Governance
- 22 March 2010: Previously excepted registration
- MANCHESTER CIRCUIT (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
49 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Caroline Wickens | Chair | 23 August 2017 |
|
|||||||||||
Cristiana Eva Manley | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Rev Catharine Anne Hughes | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Dr Nicholas Palfreyman | Trustee | 02 August 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Angela Ralph | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||
Papa Andoh-Kweku | Trustee | 27 June 2021 |
|
|||||||||||
Linda Christine Carroll | Trustee | 20 April 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||
Rev Sharon Read | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|||||||||||
Paula Collins | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||
Janet Elizabeth Hignett | Trustee | 19 March 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||
Jacqueline Victoria Blackmore | Trustee | 12 February 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||
John Alan Shuttleworth | Trustee | 18 October 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||
Heather Steward | Trustee | 18 October 2018 |
|
|||||||||||
Helen Fielding | Trustee | 08 October 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||
Abigail Hester Lorraine Parr | Trustee | 10 July 2018 |
|
|||||||||||
Janet Denise Yarwood | Trustee | 10 July 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||
Andrew Nicholas Hallett | Trustee | 30 June 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||
Dr Daphne Christine Estelle Dawson | Trustee | 24 June 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||
Graham William Ascroft | Trustee | 06 March 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||
Sam Dada | Trustee | 06 March 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||
REV KENNETH STOKES | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||||||||
Dr Erinma Bell | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|||||||||||
FIONA HELEN FULTON | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||||||||
BEVERLEY WILLIAMS | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||||||||
CHRISTINE MARY GRIME | Trustee | 13 September 2014 |
|
|||||||||||
YVONNE ANDERSON-BOYD | Trustee | 15 October 2013 |
|
|
||||||||||
HILARY MAVIS SMALL | Trustee | 25 July 2012 |
|
|
||||||||||
JULIE AMANDA ROWBOTHAM | Trustee | 24 July 2012 |
|
|
||||||||||
JENNIFER MARY WENT | Trustee | 14 February 2012 |
|
|||||||||||
JANET CAROL SANDERSON BAILEY | Trustee | 14 February 2012 |
|
|
||||||||||
RUSSELL GEORGE KIRBY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||
ELIZABETH IRENE LOUISE STUART | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||
SANDRA BAILEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||
MARY EVELYN ADAMIAK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||
SYLVIA DORRETTE PENNYCOOKE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||
DAVID GORDON POTT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||
MARGARET ANNIS MORRIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||
Christine Davis | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||
AUDREY JEAN REDSHAW BA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||
ANDREW CHARLES SLIM | Trustee |
|
||||||||||||
Dr BERNARD JAMES TREVES BROWN | Trustee |
|
||||||||||||
STEPHEN WILLIAMS | Trustee |
|
||||||||||||
SUZAN MICHELE ALLEN BSC | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||
JOHN ALAN KINSEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||
BARBARA MARY SCHOFIELD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||
ELVA KAY TOWLER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||
DR ADRIAN HAROLD WILLIAM CURTIS JP BA PHD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||
PHILIP JOHN DAVIS BED. MED. | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||
PETER SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £545.03k | £504.03k | £736.55k | £795.14k | £480.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £878.72k | £679.03k | £652.17k | £621.74k | £573.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £387.97k | £343.62k | £560.40k | £589.51k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £54.43k | £0 | £0 | £62.86k | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £97.09k | £106.85k | £113.38k | £93.72k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £5.54k | £3.72k | £2.97k | £1.81k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £49.83k | £59.79k | £47.25k | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £766.68k | £560.48k | £527.25k | £508.54k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £112.05k | £118.55k | £124.91k | £113.19k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £4.55k | £0 | £0 | £2.49k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £7.00k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £680 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 306 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 306 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 21 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 21 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 06 July 2021 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 06 July 2021 | 6 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 22 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 22 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
"DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976)"
Charitable objects
The purposes of the Methodist Church are and shall be deemed to have been since the date of union the advancement of - (a) the Christian faith in accordance with the doctrinal standards and the discipline of the Methodist Church; (b) any charitable purpose for the time being of any Connexional, district, circuit, local or other organisation of the Methodist Church; (c) any charitable purpose for the time being of any society or institution subsiduary or ancillary to the Methodist Church; (d) any purpose for the time being of any charity being a charity subsidiary or ancillary to the Methodist Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 8 The Wesley Centre
Royce Road/Old York St
Hulme
Manchester
M15 5BP
- Phone:
- 01612262702
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window