HAITIANS APPEAL RELIEF LTD
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are currently seeking donations to build a school in Port Au Prince, Delmas 55. We are still working to determine the detailed costs and these will likely be impacted by the difficulty in obtaining construction materials in the near future. We also provide 10 scholarships to students of various ages each year. This program only with under priviledge Haitians living in the Dominican Republic
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 January 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Dominican Republic
- Haiti
Governance
- 02 March 2010: Standard registration
- 22 January 2015: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2011 | 01/01/2012 | 01/01/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.00k | £6.10k | £8.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.50k | £5.00k | £7.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 January 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2013 | 06 March 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2012 | 06 March 2013 | 125 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2012 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 01 MARCH 2010
Charitable objects
THE PREVENTION AND RELIEF OF POVERTY IN HAITI BY PROVIDING GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICE TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES OF OTHER GRASS ROOT ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC OF HAITI AND UNDERPRIVILEGED HAITIANS LIVING IN THE DOMINICAN REPUBLIC.
Area of benefit
HAITI
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window