FRIENDS OF CORFU DONKEY RESCUE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
OUR MISSION IS TO CREATE AWARENESS AND RAISE FUNDS TO HELP CORFU DONKEY RESCUE - THE ONLY REGISTERED DONKEY CHARITY IN GREECE (NO. 1178). THEIR AIM IS TO RESCUE ABANDONED AND UNWANTED DONKEYS IN CORFU; TAKING IN THE OLD, INJURED AND SICK DONKEYS AND CARING FOR THEM. CDR HAS A POLICY OF RE-HOMING DONKEYS ONCE THEY HAVE BEEN BROUGHT BACK TO HEALTH IN COUNTRIES LIKE AUSTRIA, HOLLAND, GERMANY.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Hampshire
- West Sussex
Governance
- 04 June 2010: Standard registration
- FRIENDS OF CDR (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Suzanne Elizabeth Ayling | Trustee | 15 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
JOHN AYLING | Trustee | 15 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
SALLY AYLING | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.87k | £41.15k | £29.62k | £11.27k | £30.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.61k | £37.65k | £17.09k | £20.24k | £353 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 27 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 27 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 23 June 2024 | 84 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 05 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 05 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 06 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 27 APRIL 2010
Charitable objects
TO SUPPORT THE ACTIVITIES OF THE CORFU DONKEY RESCUE, A REGISTERED CHARITY IN GREECE - NO - 1178- WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES.
Area of benefit
GREECE
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 BLONDELL DRIVE
BOGNOR REGIS
PO21 4BQ
- Phone:
- 01243266258
- Email:
- friendsofcdr@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window