MOTHER MARY CHARLES WALKER CHARITABLE FOUNDATION HHCJ

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Exclusively charitable purposes in any part of the world as the Trustees in their discretion think fit and in particular the prevention or relief of poverty of children located in Eastern Europe, by providing grants for the assistance of individual children in need or to charities or other organisations with the same aims
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Albania
- Armenia
- Belarus
- Moldova
Governance
- 28 June 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LEONIE-MARTHA OKARAGA | Chair |
|
|
|||||
SISTER ELIZABETH EKPENYONG WILLS-OBONG | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GERALD EDWARD KIDD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SISTER RITA MICHAEL ETUK | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.93k | £1.20k | £1.51k | £1.90k | £2.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £660 | £27 | £1.33k | £1.56k | £1.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 14 DECEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE CAPITAL AND INCOME OF THE TRUST FUND UPON TRUST TO APPLY THE INCOME, AND ALL OR SUCH PART OR PARTS OF THE CAPITAL, AT SUCH TIME OR TIMES AND IN SUCH MANNER TO, OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF, SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR DISCRETION THINK FIT AND IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING FOR THE FOLLOWING PURPOSES: THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY OF CHILDREN LOCATED IN EASTERN EUROPE, BY PROVIDING GRANTS FOR THE ASSISTANCE OF INDIVIDUAL CHILDREN IN NEED OR TO CHARITIES OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WITH THE SAME AIMS.
Area of benefit
THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
POTHECARY WITHAM WELD SOLICITORS
The Office Group, Thomas House
84 Eccleston Square
Pimlico
London
SW1V 1PX
- Phone:
- 02078020140
- Email:
- ctyson@pwwsolicitors.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window