RAF WADDINGTON OFFICERS MESS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE CHARITY AIMS TO BENEFIT THE LIVES OF SERVICE PERSONNEL AT RAF WADDINGTON.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Other Charitable Activities
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 10 March 2010: Standard registration
- THE OFFICERS MESS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dominic Francis Owen Holland | Trustee | 13 December 2023 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £278.50k | £148.46k | £273.83k | £277.53k | £284.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £248.55k | £121.59k | £324.01k | £264.18k | £250.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 17 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 17 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 21 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 21 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 15 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 15 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 21 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 21 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 02 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 02 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION 01 MAY 2009
Charitable objects
The charity's object (the object) is 'the promotion of efficiency of the armed forces of the Crown by the provision and support of facilities and activities for the efficiency and well-being of service personnel'.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
RAF Waddington
Lincoln
LN5 9NB
- Phone:
- 01522727271
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window