THE REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD FAVOURED PEOPLE CHAPEL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Christian Pentecostal Church where the Lord is worshipped in spirit and in truth. Also involved in support for single parents and helping teens and children in Music training.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Barking And Dagenham
- Havering
- Redbridge
- Haiti
- Nigeria
Governance
- 08 February 2010: Previously excepted registration
- RCCG FAVOURED PEOPLE CHAPEL (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BLESSING CHINWENDU EZIKE | Trustee | 29 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
OLADELE OLATUBOSUN ONAFOWOKAN | Trustee | 26 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
ADEPEJU BADARU | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
COMFORT ABOSEDE MBAMARAH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 10 January 2025 | 41 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 19 December 2023 | 19 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 19 December 2023 | 384 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 19 December 2023 | 749 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 19 December 2023 | 1114 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 27 JANUARY 2010
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE TRUST ("THE OBJECTS") ARE: 1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF CHRISTIAN FAITH IN UNITED KINGDOM AND WORLDWIDE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES SET OUT IN THE STATEMENT OF FAITH CONTAINED IN THE SCHEDULE. 2 THE RELIEF OF POVERTY.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 Framlingham Close
HACKNEY
LONDON
E5 9PR
- Phone:
- 07903663265
- Email:
- MBAMARAH@HOTMAIL.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window