SHARE THE VISION (LIBRARIES) LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the relief and education of visually impaired and other print disabled people, in particular but not exclusively by improving the quality and availability of library and information services and products which provide for the reading and information needs of such persons.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 16 July 2010: Standard registration
- SHARE THE VISION, STV (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark McCree | Chair | 02 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Paul Sean Drumm | Trustee | 20 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Emma Jane Watkins | Trustee | 27 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Richard John Holmes | Trustee | 12 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lara Amanda Marshall | Trustee | 08 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Zina Sabovic | Trustee | 27 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Emma Scott | Trustee | 26 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Ann Chelin | Trustee | 08 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Alexandra Britton | Trustee | 10 June 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.50k | £0 | £14.00k | £4.03k | £7.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.03k | £3.41k | £4.38k | £19.23k | £9.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 17 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 13 March 2024 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 14 March 2023 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 18 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 08 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES 0F ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 11 APRIL 1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 27 APRIL 2010
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF AND EDUCATION OF VISUALLY IMPAIRED AND OTHER PRINT DISABLED PEOPLE, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY IMPROVING THE QUALITY AND AVAILABILITY OF LIBRARY AND INFORMATION SERVICES AND PRODUCTS WHICH PROVIDE FOR THE READING AND INFORMATION NEEDS OF SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Royal National Institute For The Blind
The Grimaldi Building
154A Pentonville Road
LONDON
N1 9JE
- Phone:
- 07585128113
- Email:
- markmccree@hotmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window