Trustees WADE STREET CHURCH, LICHFIELD (UNITED REFORMED AND BAPTIST)
Charity number: 1134904

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Danielle Leigh | Chair | 14 October 2023 |
|
|||||
Jane Hardy | Trustee | 26 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Helena Maija Cresswell | Trustee | 14 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lawrence Frank Williams | Trustee | 14 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Louise Kerry Charters | Trustee | 14 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dennis Platt | Trustee | 14 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Keith Geoffrey Newton | Trustee | 16 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Genevieve Evelyn Caroline Cannan | Trustee | 14 March 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.